Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 15 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6861 Week
» 18408 Month
» 418090 Year
» 494677 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9600   28/02/1945

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Tue 28/02/1945
Withdrawal During 09/1965
Service Life 20 yrs, 6 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 22/04/1961
88J Aberdare 4w/e 03/11/1962
87A Neath (Court Sart) w/e 08/11/1964
86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 5w/e 16/05/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 22/04/1961
ALLOC 88J Aberdare 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 3w/e 02/11/1964
ALLOC 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 5w/e 16/05/1965
WDN   10/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1945 To Service To service as GWR Number 9600
Built at Swindon Works
   
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (88J)    
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
16/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B)    
09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 9600    

prev prev