Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 478 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1863 Week
» 8668 Month
» 115614 Year
» 1337179 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9603   19/05/1945

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 19/05/1945
Withdrawal During 12/1963
Scrapping During 09/1964
Service Life 18 yrs, 6 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 06/11/1954
88C Barry 4w/e 08/09/1962
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 09/02/1963
88C Barry 4w/e 02/11/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 88C Barry 5w/e 02/11/1963
WDN   4w/e 31/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1945 To Service To service as GWR Number 9603
Built at Swindon Works
   
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 9603    

prev prev