Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 680 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14086 Week
» 67102 Month
» 186629 Year
» 3213482 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9616 |
on |
28/09/1945 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
352 |
To Service |
Wed 28/09/1945 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 25/08/1965 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/09/1945 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9616 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
03/11/1945 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
23/03/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Llantrisant (LTS) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
25/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9616 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|