|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/08/1962 | Wolverhampton Works (In Works) | In Works: 1020, 1630, 3615, 3721, 4636, 4697, 4703, 5181/4, 5564, 6160, 6614/8, 7739, 7816, 8104, 9422/70, 9613/24/6/47/65, 82008; Weigh house: 6156; Awaiting works: 3217, 4938/61, 5065, 5658, 7002, 7824, 9415. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/11/1945 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 9626 Built at Swindon Works |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - St Philips Marsh (SPM) | ||
20/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F) | ||
18/05/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
02/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) | ||
10/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
03/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) | ||
19/09/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (85A) | ||
31/12/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 9626 | ||
06/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |