Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 894 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6499 Week
» 18046 Month
» 417728 Year
» 494315 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9629   13/12/1945

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Wed 13/12/1945
Withdrawal During 10/1964
Service Life 18 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83C Exeter 8w/e 11/07/1953
89A Oswestry 4w/e 21/05/1960
88L Cardiff East Dock 2w/e 17/11/1962
86G Pontypool Road 3w/e 04/05/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/12/1945
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 89A Oswestry 4w/e 21/05/1960
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 2w/e 17/11/1962
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 3w/e 04/05/1964
WDN   3w/e 05/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1945 To Service To service as GWR Number 9629
Built at Swindon Works
   
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Oswestry (89A)    
26/11/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
04/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 9629    

prev prev