Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 412 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2858 Week
» 14563 Month
» 346052 Year
» 422639 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9642   03/04/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 03/04/1946
Withdrawal During 11/1964
Service Life 18 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88E Abercynon 4w/e 29/12/1956
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 14/06/1958
81C Southall 4w/e 18/04/1959
81A Old Oak Common 5w/e 24/08/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW WES Westbury m/e 30/04/1946
ALLOC WEY Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 22/03/1947
ALLOC WES Westbury 4w/e 07/08/1948
ALLOC WEY Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 3w/e 10/08/1964
WDN   2w/e 28/11/1964
WDN   m/e 30/11/1964
WDN   5w/e 04/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1946 To Service To service as GWR Number 9642
Built at Swindon Works
   
29/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
18/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
24/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 9642    
07/05/1966 Sightings Birds Scrapyard, Bridgend: Dumped RO 8/1966 Link

prev prev