Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 399 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1784 Week
» 8589 Month
» 115535 Year
» 1337100 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9648   25/05/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Tue 25/05/1946 to Cardiff Canton (CDF)
Withdrawal During 07/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 18 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CDF Cardiff Canton (New) 25/05/1946
88C Barry 4w/e 08/09/1962
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 09/02/1963
88H Tondu 4w/e 06/04/1963
87A Neath (Court Sart) 3w/e 04/05/1964
87F Llanelly 7w/e 22/06/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 88H Tondu 4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 3w/e 04/05/1964
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 2w/e 16/05/1964
WDN   w/e 08/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1946 To Service To service as GWR Number 9648
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)
   
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
06/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tondu (88H)    
04/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 9648    

prev prev