Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 404 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2850 Week
» 14555 Month
» 346044 Year
» 422631 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9681   03/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 03/05/1949
Withdrawal During 08/1965
Service Life 16 yrs, 2 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
89A Oswestry 4w/e 21/04/1956
88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/12/1960
88C Barry 4w/e 08/09/1962
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 09/02/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW TDU Tondu m/e 31/05/1949
ALLOC 89A Oswestry 4w/e 21/04/1956
ALLOC 86C Hereford 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 09/02/1963
TOSTORE   4w/e 11/07/1965
WDN   4w/e 08/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/05/1949 To Service To service as GWR Number 9681
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Oswestry (89A)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 9681    

prev prev