Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 780 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5381 Week
» 16928 Month
» 416610 Year
» 493197 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9682   09/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 09/05/1949
Withdrawal During 08/1965
Service Life 16 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 16/07/1960
88B Radyr w/e 08/11/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   06/05/1949
NEW TYS Tyseley m/e 31/05/1949
ALLOC 86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 16/07/1960
ALLOC 88B Radyr 3w/e 02/11/1964
WDN   4w/e 08/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/05/1949 To Service To service as GWR Number 9682
Built at Swindon Works
   
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H)    
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 9682    

prev prev