Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1949 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15355 Week
» 68371 Month
» 187898 Year
» 3214751 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
804 |
m/e |
03/1944 |
War Dept. |
70804 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3045 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63045 |
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
British Railways |
90045 |
on |
03/11/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
General |
The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 |
SLS/194704 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 804 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25312 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 70804 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3045 |
|
|
26/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63045 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |
|
|
03/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90045 |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Consett (54D) |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
27/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90045 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|