Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 343 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18146 Week
» 71162 Month
» 190689 Year
» 3217542 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
818 |
m/e |
04/1944 |
War Dept. |
70818 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3050 |
on |
16/02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63050 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
British Railways |
90050 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1944 |
31B |
|
March |
4w/e |
18/10/1952 |
31B |
|
March |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
38A |
|
Colwick |
4w/e |
14/02/1953 |
34E |
|
New England |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
18/05/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
CLK |
Colwick |
on |
22/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
w/e |
26/10/1946 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
36B |
Mexborough |
4w/e |
24/01/1953 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
ALLOC |
34E |
New England |
4w/e |
20/02/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/05/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 818 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24896 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 70818 |
|
|
16/02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3050 |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63050 |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90050 |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
20/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
18/05/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90050 |
|
|
07/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|