Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 835 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18638 Week
» 71654 Month
» 191181 Year
» 3218034 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
823 |
m/e |
04/1944 |
War Dept. |
70823 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3053 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63053 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
British Railways |
90053 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
MAR |
March |
on |
29/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
36B |
Mexborough |
4w/e |
19/06/1954 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
4w/e |
16/04/1960 |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
4w/e |
29/10/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/07/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1945 |
Austerities |
It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them. 280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944. |
SLS/194602 |
04/10/1958 |
Colwich MPD - stored locomotives |
63729, 63839, 63614, 64976/88, 61739/52/3/4/80, 90005/25/53/288; J50s are going into store as new diesel shunters arrive (D3624/5/6/7 have arrived). |
SLS/195811 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 823 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25165 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 70823 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3053 |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63053 |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90053 |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
18/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
16/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
15/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
04/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90053 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge |
|
|