|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/07/1964 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. | SLS/196408 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 827 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25169 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 70827 | ||
16/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3056 | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63056 but not taken up | ||
28/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
29/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
11/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90056 | ||
16/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
11/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
11/09/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
31/12/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
03/05/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90056 | ||
08/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |