|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1946 | General | At this date (30/11/1946) only the following Scottish Area engines still require to be renumbered: 4488, 4491, 2745, 4819, 4891, 4898, 3658, 3682, 3692, 1996, 9765, 6897, 3057, 9499, 9886, 9384, 6398, 6399, 6401, 265, 320, 9201, 9204, 9368, 9255, 9263, 9429, 9046, 2980, 9632, 9644, 9668, 9757, 9790, 7348, 9524, 9527; a total of 37, or 3 per cent. of the total stock | SLS/194701 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 828 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25170 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 70828 | ||
03/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3057 | ||
27/03/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63057 | ||
04/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
09/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90057 | ||
20/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
08/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
21/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
31/12/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Goole (50D) | ||
24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90057 | ||
01/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |