Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1707 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19510 Week
» 72526 Month
» 192053 Year
» 3218906 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
829 |
m/e |
05/1944 |
War Dept. |
70829 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90321 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
25E |
Sowerby Bridge |
w/e |
24/06/1950 |
ALLOC |
25D |
Mirfield |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
ALLOC |
56A |
Wakefield |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
ALLOC |
52G |
Sunderland |
8w/e |
31/12/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/07/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
30/11/1947 |
WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport |
|
On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops. |
|
Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service |
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/08/1947 |
Stratton Park |
The following 'Austerity' 2-8-0 were noted at Stratton Park dump (a few miles on the London side of Swindon) on 17/8 awaiting works:-70829, 77141, 77237, 77368, 77394, 77399, 78621, 78624, 79254, 79273 and 79294, whilst 79303 was actually outside Swindon Works. |
SLS/194709 |
13/08/1967 |
Sunderland MPD |
On Sunday, 13th August, the following were on Sunderland shed: 63395, 63437/58, 65789/95, 65804/11/2/55/79/80/2/92/4, 90112/35, 90321/48/78/82, 90417, 90698, D2110, D3078, D3678, D6824/8/96. |
SLS/196709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 829 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24899 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 70829 |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90321 |
|
|
24/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) |
|
|
01/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90321 |
|
|
12/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|