Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4412 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13986 Week
» 78940 Month
» 281604 Year
» 3308457 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
831 |
m/e |
05/1944 |
War Dept. |
70831 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3059 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63059 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90059 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
NWE |
New England |
on |
29/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/04/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/05/1965 |
Doncaster MPD (Shed stored) |
Shed stored: 63741, 90059/70/120/647. |
SLS/196506 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 831 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24901 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 70831 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3059 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63059 but not taken up |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90059 |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
04/04/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90059 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale |
|
|