|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 18/10/1950 | 11/11/1950 | 25 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1952 | 31/10/1952 | 33 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1952 | 05/11/1952 | 2 days | Adjustment | Adjustments |
||
Darlington Works | 09/10/1954 | 05/11/1954 | 28 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/11/1956 | 14/12/1956 | 28 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/01/1959 | 07/02/1959 | 18 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/06/1959 | 15/06/1959 | 1 day | Non Classified | EO |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/08/1959 | 11/08/1959 | 5 days | Non Classified | EO |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/10/1960 | 19/10/1960 | 2 days | Non Classified | EO |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/04/1963 | Eastfield MPD (waiting Works) | 61008 transferred from LMR, ex Works-65916/32, and waiting Works-44194, 45713/24, 57653, 61147/80/346, 64527, 64790/814/44/69/97/910/24/9, 90060 an 90759. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 832 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24902 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 70832 | ||
02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3060 | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63060 but not taken up | ||
12/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
18/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1950. Dep: 11/11/1950. | ||
11/11/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90060 | ||
29/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1952. Dep: 31/10/1952. | ||
04/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Adjustment) - Arr: 04/11/1952. Dep: 05/11/1952. Work undertaken: Adjustments |
||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
09/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1954. Dep: 05/11/1954. | ||
16/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
17/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1956. Dep: 14/12/1956. | ||
23/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
20/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) | ||
08/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
21/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 21/01/1959. Dep: 07/02/1959. | ||
15/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 15/06/1959. Dep: 15/06/1959. Work undertaken: EO |
||
07/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 07/08/1959. Dep: 11/08/1959. Work undertaken: EO |
||
18/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 18/10/1960. Dep: 19/10/1960. Work undertaken: EO |
||
25/09/1961 | To Store | To Store | ||
11/06/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90060 | ||
08/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |