|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
23/07/1961 | Crewe Works (Works Sidings) | Paint Shop: D110-2, 42121, 42235, 42579, 42658/9/77, 44987, 45224, 45415/35, 45588, 49395. Outside Paint Shop: D108/13-5, 45658. Works Sidings: 40580, 42377, 42481, 42507, 42602, 44148/75, 44728/66/79, 44824, 44929/49, 45005, 45247, 45445, 45516/44, 45610/30, 46110/35, 47277, 48154, 49049, 90194, 90323, 90621, 92096. Erecting Shop: D116-21, D269, 41229/68, 42158, 42218, 42562/89, 42610, 44374, 44658/85/6, 44821/71/88, 45045/75, 45104/85/99, 45218/48/54/96, 45333/45/73, 45529/89, 45611/8/9/61/72, 46102/31/55, 46243, 46441, 48287, 48393, 48446, 48697, 48732/61/7, 90264, 90327/81, 90646/58, 92030/2/72/7. Outside Erecting Shop: 42086, 42234, 42652, 44687, 45189, 45410, 46142. New Erecting Shop: D76, D122-8, D331, D5142. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5078. Scrap Yard: 43268, 43962, 47418, 58305 intact, 41529 just cut up. Works Shunters: 12071, 42984, 43957, 47618, 51412/44/6, 52093, 52312, 52441/59. | SLS/196109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 834 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24904 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 70834 | ||
04/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
02/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90323 | ||
01/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) | ||
31/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdare (86J) | ||
21/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) | ||
16/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) | ||
08/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
05/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Banbury (84C) | ||
03/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) | ||
20/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
04/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90323 | ||
10/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |