|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 18/09/1946 | 05/10/1946 | 18 days | Light Repair | Boiler wrecked - short of water |
||
Gateshead Works | 27/04/1947 | 16/05/1947 | 20 days | Unclassified | Select WI |
||
Scotswood | 04/06/1948 | 06/07/1948 | 33 days | General | Renumbered to BR (1st BR) number 63061 |
||
Gateshead Works | 02/01/1950 | 20/01/1950 | 19 days | Unclassified | Left cylinder loose |
||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1950 | 30/12/1950 | 34 days | General | Axleboxes and motion badly worn |
||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1953 | 11/07/1953 | 20 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/02/1955 | 25/03/1952 | -1049 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1955 | 10/12/1955 | 20 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1957 | 14/11/1957 | 24 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1961 | 27/07/1961 | 39 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1964 | 22/08/1964 | 81 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | General | The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 | SLS/194704 |
09/07/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. | SLS/196108 |
04/07/1964 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. | SLS/196408 |
13/08/1967 | West Hartlepool MPD | The following were on West Hartlepool on 13th August: 43015, 62026/41/2/4, 63344/87/94/7, 63407/31/5, 90061/74/6/116/210/30/54/309/39/47/60/434/59/78/92, 90627/77/95, D2068/77/8, D2153, D2205, D3137/9, D3672, D5152/65, D6756/63/6/9. | SLS/196709 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 837 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24907 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 70837 | ||
03/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) (Ex War Department) | ||
18/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/09/1946. Dep: 05/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler wrecked - short of water |
||
02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3061 | ||
13/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
27/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1947. Dep: 16/05/1947. Work undertaken: Select WI |
||
04/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Scotswood (General) - Arr: 04/06/1948. Dep: 06/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (1st BR) number 63061 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
13/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
01/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90061 | ||
02/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/01/1950. Dep: 20/01/1950. Work undertaken: Left cylinder loose |
||
27/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1950. Dep: 30/12/1950. Work undertaken: Axleboxes and motion badly worn |
||
19/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
22/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1953. Dep: 11/07/1953. | ||
21/03/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
08/02/1955 | Tender | Tender fitted: BR5 number 587 | ||
08/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/02/1955. Dep: 25/03/1952. | ||
31/03/1955 | Tender | Tender fitted: BR5 number 62 | ||
21/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1955. Dep: 10/12/1955. | ||
22/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1957. Dep: 14/11/1957. | ||
11/1957 | Tender | Tender fitted: BR5 number 82 | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
14/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
19/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1961. Dep: 27/07/1961. | ||
03/06/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1964. Dep: 22/08/1964. | ||
03/12/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
27/06/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90061 | ||
10/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |