Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1704 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19507 Week
» 72523 Month
» 192050 Year
» 3218903 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
840 |
m/e |
05/1944 |
War Dept. |
70840 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3062 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63062 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
British Railways |
90062 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1944 |
30A |
|
Stratford |
on |
06/02/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/01/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NWE |
New England |
on |
18/02/1947 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/01/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1952 |
Locomotives still carrying old numbers (WD) |
Engines which have not yet been finally renumbered. 63062, 77040, 77184, 77388, 70808, 70839, 70876, 77288, 78521, 77099, 77102, 77476, 77481, 73788, 73794. |
SLS/195206 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 840 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24910 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 70840 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3062 |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63062 |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90062 |
|
|
06/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
07/01/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90062 |
|
|
28/02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Stratford |
|
|