|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Scotswood | 15/08/1947 | 03/12/1947 | 111 days | General | |||
Scotswood | 13/05/1948 | 09/07/1948 | 58 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/10/1950 | 11/11/1950 | 34 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/08/1952 | 20/09/1952 | 27 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/08/1953 | 03/09/1953 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 29/07/1954 | 10/09/1954 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1955 | 28/07/1955 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1956 | 07/06/1956 | 31 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1958 | 21/10/1958 | 30 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1958 | 31/12/1958 | 17 days | Non Classified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1960 | 29/08/1960 | 8 days | Non Classified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1962 | 19/04/1962 | 36 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Stripping Shop Yard) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 848 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24921 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 70848 | ||
22/11/1945 | Allocation | Loaned to Colwick (CLK) (ex War Department) | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3068 | ||
15/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Scotswood (General) - Arr: 15/08/1947. Dep: 03/12/1947. | ||
01/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
13/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Scotswood (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 13/05/1948. Dep: 09/07/1948. | ||
23/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
17/07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63068 | ||
29/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
09/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1950. Dep: 11/11/1950. | ||
11/11/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90068 | ||
25/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1952. Dep: 20/09/1952. | ||
27/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/08/1953. Dep: 03/09/1953. | ||
29/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1954. Dep: 10/09/1954. | ||
05/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/07/1955. Dep: 28/07/1955. | ||
08/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1956. Dep: 07/06/1956. | ||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
22/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1958. Dep: 21/10/1958. | ||
15/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 15/12/1958. Dep: 31/12/1958. | ||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
08/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
22/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 22/08/1960. Dep: 29/08/1960. | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
15/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1962. Dep: 19/04/1962. | ||
05/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
10/07/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90068 | ||
10/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by R A Kings: Norwich |