Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1693 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15099 Week
» 68115 Month
» 187642 Year
» 3214495 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
850 |
m/e |
06/1944 |
War Dept. |
70850 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90330 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 850 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24922 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 70850 |
|
|
09/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90330 |
|
|
21/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
29/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
19/12/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90330 |
|
|
03/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by W George, Station Steel: Wath |
|
|