Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 127 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 5936 Week
» 13120 Month
» 321101 Year
» 1205482 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 850 m/e 06/1944
War Dept. 70850 m/e 01/1945
BR 90330 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 24922
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 19/12/1965
Scrapping During 03/1966 at W George, Station Steel (Wath)
Service Life 21 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
38A Colwick 3w/e 31/05/1950
38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 25/11/1950
38A Colwick 4w/e 21/07/1951
36B Mexborough 4w/e 14/02/1953
41D Canklow w/e 28/09/1963
36A Doncaster w/e 19/06/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 19/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough 18/10/1947
ALLOC GRA Grantham w/e 09/04/1949
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 21/05/1950
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 29/10/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 41D Canklow 6w/e 05/10/1963
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 19/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 850
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24922
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70850    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90330    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90330    
03/1966 Scrapped Broken up by W George, Station Steel: Wath    

prev prev