Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 63 Today
» 1145 Yesterday
» 6109 Week
» 25754 Month
» 60396 Year
» 1281961 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR (1st BR) 63069   Not applied
War Dept. 854 m/e 06/1944
War Dept. 70854 m/e 01/1945
LNER (1946) 3069 m/e 02/1947
BR 90069 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 24915
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal Sun 30/01/1966
Scrapping During 05/1966 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 21 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 31/08/1951
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/02/1953
86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 06/11/1954
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 01/01/1955
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/10/1959
81C Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962
36A Doncaster w/e 08/12/1962
41D Canklow w/e 26/01/1963
41H Staveley (G.C.) w/e 03/04/1965
41J Langwith Junction w/e 19/06/1965
   Withdrawn 30/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley 29/06/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 15/11/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 14/02/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 13/08/1949
LOAN 40B Immingham 02/09/1951
ALLOC 40B Immingham w/e 08/09/1951
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 22/09/1951
LOAN 84B Oxley m/e 31/10/1951
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 02/12/1962
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 41D Canklow 3w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 5w/e 03/04/1965
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   30/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 854
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24915
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70854    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90069    
31/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
26/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
03/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90069    
05/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev