Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 349 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18152 Week
» 71168 Month
» 190695 Year
» 3217548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
858 |
m/e |
07/1944 |
War Dept. |
70858 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3072 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63072 |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
British Railways |
90072 |
m/e |
07/1950 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
HTN |
Heaton |
on |
15/07/1947 |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
on |
15/07/1947 |
ALLOC |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
w/e |
01/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
4w/e |
20/02/1960 |
ALLOC |
50D |
Goole |
4w/e |
07/09/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
27/12/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/03/1962 |
Darlington MPD (Ex-Works) |
Ex-Works on 51A: D3072, D3874, D5108, 43055, 43101, 60835, 60939, 61019/39, 63388, 65794, 65889/92, 68011, 80116, 90072, 90342, 90503. Waiting works on 51A: 12115, 43070/5, 46494, 60811/44, 61237, 68754, 78015, 92098. |
SLS/196205 |
09/09/1963 |
Thornaby MPD (in store) |
The steam allocation here is now in store viz. 60859/946, 65859/84, 67635/40, 68023/39, 76024, 77001/11/4, 90072/81/406/46/51/593. From 9th September (when West Aukland closed) seven type 3 d/es now work all former West Aukland duties. |
SLS/196310 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 858 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24928 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 70858 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3072 |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63072 |
|
|
07/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90072 |
|
|
20/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
06/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
31/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
27/12/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90072 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|