Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3476 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16882 Week
» 69898 Month
» 189425 Year
» 3216278 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9722 |
on |
04/12/1934 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
285 |
To Service |
Fri 04/12/1934 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 13/07/1962 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
RDGw |
Reading (W.R.) |
4w/e |
23/02/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/07/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/12/1934 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9722 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
23/03/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (RDG) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Reading (W.R.) (RDG) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Slough (81B) |
|
|
13/07/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9722 |
|
|
12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|