Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1906 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19709 Week
» 72725 Month
» 192252 Year
» 3219105 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9737 |
on |
14/01/1935 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
285 |
To Service |
Wed 14/01/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 14/12/1960 |
Service Life |
25 yrs , 11 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
14/01/1935 |
DYD |
|
Duffryn Yard |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/12/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/12/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/01/1935 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9737 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Duffryn Yard (DYD) |
|
|
14/12/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9737 |
|
|
03/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|