Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2042 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19845 Week
» 72861 Month
» 192388 Year
» 3219241 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9758 |
on |
26/06/1935 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
285 |
To Service |
Mon 26/06/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/05/1962 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
26/06/1935 |
RDG |
|
Reading (W.R.) |
4w/e |
16/11/1935 |
PDN |
|
Old Oak Common |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/05/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/05/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/06/1935 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9758 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (RDG) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Old Oak Common (PDN) |
|
|
07/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9758 |
|
|
09/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|