Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1798 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15204 Week
» 68220 Month
» 187747 Year
» 3214600 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7004 |
m/e |
02/1943 |
War Dept. |
77004 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90104 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/01/1966 |
Colwick MPD |
Consequent upon the transfer of Colwick depot to the London Midland Region on 3rd January, 1966, the following locomotives allocated to that depot have been transferred to L.M. Region Book Stock with effect from 2nd January: D2300/1/2, D3442/89/90, D3625/6/7/8, D4064/86, 61089/92/232/81/302/90, 63644/74/5/816/73, 90104/413/533/606/69/89/706. In addition, the L.M.R. locos. transferred to Colwick, on loan, have now been returned to L.M. Reg. stock, following the transfer of the depot to that Region, together with D3152/3/64/6 and D5195 which were also on loan. |
SLS/196603 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7004 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24975 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77004 |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90104 |
|
|
03/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
18/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90104 |
|
|
06/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|