Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 166 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5920 Week
» 33878 Month
» 68520 Year
» 1290085 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7006 m/e 02/1943
War Dept. 77006 m/e 01/1945
BR 90106 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 24977
To Service During 02/1943
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Scrapping During 12/1962 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 19 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
33B Tilbury 4w/e 12/04/1958
31B March w/e 27/06/1959
33A Plaistow w/e 10/10/1959
33B Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
34E New England w/e 02/12/1961
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NPT Newport (Teeside) 22/03/1947
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 35A New England 12/07/1953
LOAN 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/03/1958
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 34E New England 5w/e 09/12/1961
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7006
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24977
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77006    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90106    
12/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
27/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
10/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90106    
12/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev