Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 325 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 325 Week
» 7509 Month
» 315490 Year
» 1199871 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7013 m/e 03/1943
War Dept. 77013 m/e 01/1945
BR 90111 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 24984
To Service During 03/1943
Withdrawal Mon 06/04/1964
Scrapping During 07/1964 at W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield)
Service Life 21 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
31B March 4w/e 21/10/1950
36C Frodingham 5w/e 24/03/1951
   Withdrawn 06/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NEV Neville Hill 14/10/1947
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 31B March w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 36C Frodingham m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 12/07/1953
WDN   06/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7013
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24984
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77013    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90111    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90111    
07/1964 Scrapped Broken up by W.E.Smiths: Ecclesfield    

prev prev