Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 106 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4066 Week
» 33652 Month
» 407665 Year
» 1629230 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7014 on 26/03/1943
War Dept. 77014 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90112 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24985
To Service Tue 26/03/1943
Withdrawal Tue 10/01/1967
Scrapping During 12/1967 at Arnott Young (Dinsdale)
Service Life 23 yrs, 9 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 26/03/1943
24A Accrington 8w/e 14/06/1952
25D Mirfield 4w/e 03/12/1955
56A Wakefield 5w/e 14/06/1958
52G Sunderland 4w/e 03/12/1966
   Withdrawn on 10/01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN OXY Oxley m/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC BAN Banbury m/e 31/07/1947
LOAN 24C Lostock Hall on 13/04/1949
ALLOC 26F Lees (Oldham) w/e 30/04/1949
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall w/e 14/05/1949
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen w/e 13/10/1951
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 25D Mirfield 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 14/06/1958
WDN   w/e 06/02/1965
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 8w/e 31/12/1966
WDN   on 10/01/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/03/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7014
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24985
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77014    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90112    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
03/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
10/01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90112    

prev prev