|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 61061, 1724, 61909/94, 62411/17/29/55, 2462/69, 62472, 2480, 62485/98, 62675, 2691, 63019/63, 3172, 64527, 4568/74/77, 4922, 5908, 8453, 8952, 68958, 9133, 69150, 9193, 69221, 9518/64, 73777, 77016, 79306, 90313. | SLS/195002 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1943 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7016 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24987 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77016 | ||
04/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
03/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90114 | ||
24/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) | ||
01/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) | ||
19/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
30/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) | ||
07/07/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90114 | ||
10/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |