Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 134 Today
» 1048 Yesterday
» 2119 Week
» 9303 Month
» 317284 Year
» 1201665 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7023 m/e 03/1943
War Dept. 77023 m/e 01/1945
BR 90120 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 24994
To Service During 03/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 04/04/1965
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Arnott Young (Dinsdale)
Service Life 22 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
38A Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
36C Frodingham w/e 22/10/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 04/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough 22/10/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   w/e 04/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7023
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24994
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77023    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90120    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
08/11/1964 Sightings A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed John Thickitt Link
04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90120    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale    

prev prev