Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7024 m/e 03/1943
War Dept. 77024 m/e 01/1945
BR 90121 w/e 23/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 24995
To Service During 03/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 20/06/1965
Scrapping During 09/1965 at Arnott Young (Parkgate)
Service Life 22 yrs, 3 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
27B Aintree 4w/e 08/09/1951
27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 28/11/1953
26C Bolton w/e 06/02/1960
41J Langwith Junction w/e 12/09/1964
41H Staveley (G.C.) w/e 16/01/1965
41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 19/06/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 20/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 11/07/1948
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 01/09/1951
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 12/09/1964
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 06/02/1965
WDN   w/e 20/06/1965
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 26/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7024
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24995
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77024    
12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90121    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
28/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90121    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
09/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate    

prev prev