Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1315 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14721 Week
» 67737 Month
» 187264 Year
» 3214117 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7032 |
m/e |
04/1943 |
War Dept. |
77032 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90129 |
w/e |
04/11/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1945 |
Calais MPD |
77032 an 77169 were noted at Calais shed in December, painted in the Nord red-brown and lined out in scarlet. |
SLS/194602 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7032 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25003 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77032 |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90129 |
|
|
23/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
18/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90129 |
|
|
01/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh |
|
|