|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61002/76, 61132, 1278, 61741/55/75, 1776, 61787, 61885, 61924, 62413/34, 2458, 62459, 2472, 62481, 3148, 63194, 64588, 4598, 4710, 4852/70, 4928, 64944, 4950, 5900, 65907, 7466, 67498, 67626/59/61, 68322, 8343, 8451/70/78, 69192, 69201/22, 9224, ex L.M.S. 4786, 44793, 54654, 56038, ex W.D. 77039/63, 77313/24, 90774. The only classes noted ex Cowlairs so far with the crest are 'B.1', 'J.39', 'K.2', 'K.3' and W.D. 2-8-0 and 2-10-0. No former N.B. engines have been noted with the crest, but many are lined in the latest style. | SLS/194911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1943 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7039 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25010 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77039 | ||
10/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90134 | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
21/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) | ||
30/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) | ||
30/07/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90134 | ||
01/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |