Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 163 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2070 Week
» 20852 Month
» 269145 Year
» 1153526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7051 m/e 05/1943
War Dept. 77051 m/e 01/1945
BR 90522 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 4867
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 02/05/1965
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 22 yrs , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
31B March 4w/e 20/10/1951
30A Stratford w/e 03/12/1960
31A Cambridge w/e 25/03/1961
33B Tilbury w/e 22/04/1961
31B March w/e 17/06/1961
36A Doncaster w/e 28/10/1961
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 09/03/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 02/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK HTN Heaton 09/04/1947
ALLOC MAR March 15/07/1947
ALLOC COL Colchester w/e 08/05/1948
ALLOC 31B March w/e 20/10/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford 5w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 5w/e 08/04/1961
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 5w/e 13/05/1961
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 5w/e 06/04/1963
WDN   w/e 02/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7051
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4867
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77051    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90522    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
25/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
28/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
24/10/1964 Sightings A visit to Retford (G.N.) shed: On shed John Thickitt Link
05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90522    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev