Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 889 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 3004 Week
» 25510 Month
» 328700 Year
» 1550265 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7055 m/e 05/1943
War Dept. 77055 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90526 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2289
Works Number 4871
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Scrapping During 01/1964 at Central Wagon Co. (Wigan)
Service Life 19 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1943
35A New England 5w/e 16/02/1952
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/02/1955
33A Plaistow 4w/e 19/03/1955
33A Plaistow 3w/e 14/05/1955
   Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 08/06/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 27/06/1947
ALLOC TDK Tyne Dock on 05/10/1947
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 16/04/1949
ALLOC STV Staveley (G.C.) w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 21/05/1955
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7055
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4871
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77055    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90526    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
19/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
14/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90526    

prev prev