Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 131 Today
» 1233 Yesterday
» 5224 Week
» 7806 Month
» 272439 Year
» 1494004 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7056 m/e 05/1943
War Dept. 77056 m/e 01/1945
BR 90527 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2289
Works Number 4872
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/05/1963
Scrapping During 06/1963 at Locomotive Works (Horwich)
Service Life 20 yrs , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1943
91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 17/06/1950
25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 26/01/1952
25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 23/02/1952
25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 21/02/1953
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 08/08/1953
25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 03/10/1953
27B Aintree 4w/e 21/04/1956
   Withdrawn w/e 11/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 20/05/1950
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 3w/e 10/06/1950
LOAN 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 21/02/1953
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 08/08/1953
EXLOAN 25G Farnley Junction w/e 15/08/1953
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 05/09/1953
EXLOAN 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   w/e 11/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/03/1949 Brighton Works Engines in shops included Nos. 82 Boxhill, 2023/30/37/39/76/89, 2113, S2343, 2449, 32086, 34001 Exeter, 34003/61, 73790, 77056, 77180, 21C107 Wadebridge. SLS/194904
30/04/1949 Brighton Works A reconditioned boiler (BE.926) has arrived at Brighton for 'H.1' class locomotive No. 32037 Selsey Bill, now undergoing heavy repair. No. 34065 Hurricane ('B.O.B.' Class) which was about to leave the works in the experimental light green livery, has been repainted in the old S.R. livery with yellow bands. Re-numbered at Brighton: Nos. 32023/30 (6/4); No. 34008 Padstow (8/4); Nos. 32113 an 90527 (ex 77056) (11/4); 32525 an 34009 Lyme Regis (13/4). No. 32151, ex Eastleigh Works, was noted lined out at Brighton shed on 10/4 and on 20/4 No. 31826 was observed here in the same style. SLS/194905
30/06/1950 W.D. \"8F\" Some of the W.D. '8F' class previously on loan to the Southern Region have gone to the L.M.R., including 90332, 90347, 90527, 90619, an 90655 to Huddersfield (25B). SLS/195008

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7056
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4872
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77056    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90527    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
11/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90527    

prev prev