Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 235 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5579 Week
» 6469 Month
» 314450 Year
» 1198831 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7057 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77057 m/e 01/1945
BR 90528 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 4873
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 26/09/1965
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 22 yrs, 3 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England m/e 30/11/1949
38A Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
35A New England 5w/e 24/03/1956
35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 09/11/1957
31B March w/e 06/02/1960
30A Stratford w/e 03/12/1960
36A Doncaster w/e 23/09/1961
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 09/03/1963
40E Colwick w/e 19/06/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 26/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN IMM Immingham 09/05/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley 29/06/1947
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 18/09/1948
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 26/11/1949
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 30A Stratford 5w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 5w/e 07/10/1961
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 5w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 40E Colwick 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 26/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7057
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4873
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77057    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90528    
30/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
09/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
08/11/1964 Sightings A visit to Retford (G.C.) shed (Thrumpton): Dead on shed John Thickitt Link
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90528    
01/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev