Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 111 Today
» 1233 Yesterday
» 5204 Week
» 7786 Month
» 272419 Year
» 1493984 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7058 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77058 m/e 01/1945
BR 90529 on 11/02/1949 (Renumbered at Scotswood)

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2289
Works Number 4874
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 14/11/1965
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 22 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1943
81C Southall m/e 16/06/1956
87G Carmarthen 4w/e 22/03/1958
87F Llanelly 4w/e 18/06/1960
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 16/06/1962
41F Mexborough 02/12/1962
41D Canklow w/e 07/03/1964
41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 21/03/1964
41J Langwith Junction w/e 09/10/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 14/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN LA Laira m/e 31/01/1947
ALLOC OXF Oxford 4w/e 22/02/1947
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 19/05/1956
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 18/06/1960
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) m/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 02/12/1962
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 21/03/1964
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 5w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   w/e 14/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during January included: Nos. 198, 250, 1009, 1531, 2793, 2859/80/99, 2929/51, 3011/12/44, 3800/07/09/14, 4076/83/87, 4375, 4408, 4542/61,.4854, 4917/87, 5000/01/19/22/30/33/35/48/65/69/75/91/99, 5928/39/46/58/77/94, 6000/03/17/22, 6357/80, 6821/23/62/74, 6906/32, 7001/07, 7308, 9083, W.D. 77005/58/64, 78543/714/717, 79226/34 an 79303. Engines condemned during the same period included Nos. 242, 504, an 3585. Works pilots recently have been: Nos. 198, 905, 1713, an 1781, while 3561 has been on the carriage side. New work: Nos. 6981 , 6982 and 6983 were completed on 20/1, 26/1, and 3/2 respectively; the construction of the 0-6-0 Diesel-electric shunters (Lot 364) is now under way, and the engine of the first one has been mounted on the frames. The first engine to be lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to bear the prefix 'W' in yellow paint, under the numberplate was No. 4946 , which was ex Works on 8/1 (right-hand side only) and later emerged with both sides done on 16/1. Additional locomotives leaving the Works have been dealt with in various styles, as follows: Nos. 4100, 4217, an 5514 with 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and prefixed with a yellow 'W' (Subsequently to 26/1, all prefixes have been in white paint). Nos. 1017, 4062, 4084, 4087, an 4951 were lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and prefixed 'W'; 2880, 5388, 5529, an 6736 with plain tenders and tanks and prefixed with a 'W,' while 2830 carried 'G.W.R.' on the tender and prefixed 'W.' On 23/1 No. 7007 had the old nameplates removed and was renamed Great Western, and on 30/1 No. 7001 emerged from the Works renamed Sir James Milne, with the tender bearing 'G.W.R.' and crest; the number had not been prefixed. All W.D.'s now entering the Works have had the Westinghouse pump removed, presumably at the running sheds SLS/194803
28/02/1951 Western Region WD\'s So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). SLS/195104
19/04/1958 Carmarthen MPD W.D. 2-8-0's 90167/79/207/485/529 have been allocated to replace the remaining R.O.D's as they are withdrawn. SLS/195805
08/10/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D122-6, 42604/68, 44729/59, 44928, 45210/61, 45594, 45635/98, 46427, 49395 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D127, 42447, 42655, 44733, 45077, 45316, 45699, 46225, 78017, 92133. New Electing Shop: D8, D128/9/35-7, D327, D5016/74. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5, D227, D329. Erecting Shop: D130-4, D224, 41209/39, 42050/62, 42289/99, 42465, 42607, 44666/93, 44774, 44836/90, 44934/90, 45003/67, 45102/5/8, 45204/52/62/3, 45332/40, 45454, 45549/50, 45688/90, 46114/43, 46234, 46426, 48036/46/74/85, 48283, 48494, 48611/53, 48712, 49025/70, 49381, 70052, 71000, 90216/42/71, 90486, 92013/81/94, 92150. Outside Erecting Shop: D216, 42446, 42656, 45131, 45505, 45634/83, 48717, 78043, 92123. Minor Repair Road: 45646, 48451. Works Sidings: 41279, 42425, 42574, 44708/17/20/36/7/71, 44864/71, 45154, 45571/96, 45656, 46105/7/38/60, 46406, 48088, 48217, 48477, 48624/36, 49126, 90529/61. Scrap Yard: 40075/7/97, 40118, 42506, 43325, 47421/38/62, 47634, 52389 intact. Works Shunters: D3175, 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 47608, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196111
26/04/1964 Derby Shed (On Shed) On Shed: 45334 x Wok - Cw, D1730, D1732, 12088, 12095, D3022, D4132, D5265 ex works; On Shed: D1735 undercoat, 42161, 42181, 44042, 44134, 44243, 44909, 45002, 45186, 45253, 47320, 47447, 47461, 48199, 48208, 48391, 48490, 48541, 73139, 78057, 90136, 90078, 90357, 90529, 92022, 60876, 68079. SLS/196406

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7058
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4874
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77058    
11/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90529    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
07/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
21/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
14/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90529    

prev prev