Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1814 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19617 Week
» 72633 Month
» 192160 Year
» 3219013 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7061 |
m/e |
06/1943 |
War Dept. |
77061 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90532 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2290 |
Works Number |
4877 |
To Service |
During 06/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/12/1962 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 6 mths , 0 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/01/1947 |
General |
Several 'Austerity' 2-8-0's are being repaired for service on the L.N.E.R. both at Eastleigh and Brighton, Nos. 77046/61, 77235, 77453/4, 77484 at the former and 77070, 77108, 77402/11/18, 79220, 78603, 77129, 77371/95, 77426 at the latter. 77411 has already left Brighton shops painted black, to he followed by 77070. Shed markings include La Delivrance, Le Mans, Desing Balls, Acheres, etc. Some of the tenders bear different numbers from the engines, but are renumbered to correspond with the engine number when painted. These engines are being classified '0.7' on the L.N.E.R. |
SLS/194702 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7061 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4877 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77061 |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90532 |
|
|
29/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
20/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
25/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bidston (6F) |
|
|
15/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
28/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90532 |
|
|
01/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton |
|
|