05/01/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Locomotives in shops included:-Nos. 2039, 2325/39/51, S2376, 2514/20, S2578, 34004/15/56/64, 21C161/63, 'Austerity' 70853, 77062/90, 78597, while under construction were:-Nos. 34090, 36001 and tenders. No. 32029 which left shops on 1/1 with plain black tanks, came back to be fully-lined and was ex shops again on 5/1. 'British Railways' lettering on engines is cancelled. |
SLS/194902 |
01/02/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Engines in shops:-Nos. 21C101, CC2, 34004/05/20, 34061 73 Squadron, 34062/65, 2039/76/89, 2325, 2489, 2514, 32339, 32520 an 77062/94, for repair. Two 'Leader' Class under construction. No. 34090 left shops on 31/1 named Sir Eustace Missenden, Southern Railway Battle of Britain Class, the S.R. Coat-of-arms is also incorporated in the nameplate, the background of which is painted Air Force blue. The locomotive is painted malachite green with yellow lining, but the wheel centres instead of being black are also green and the tyres yellow. The British Railways crest is on the tender. |
SLS/194903 |
28/02/1951 |
Southern Region WD\'s |
There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. |
SLS/195104 |
03/01/1966 |
Colwick MPD |
Consequent upon the transfer of Colwick depot to the London Midland Region on 3rd January, 1966, the following locomotives allocated to that depot have been transferred to L.M. Region Book Stock with effect from 2nd January: D2300/1/2, D3442/89/90, D3625/6/7/8, D4064/86, 61089/92/232/81/302/90, 63644/74/5/816/73, 90104/413/533/606/69/89/706. In addition, the L.M.R. locos. transferred to Colwick, on loan, have now been returned to L.M. Reg. stock, following the transfer of the depot to that Region, together with D3152/3/64/6 and D5195 which were also on loan. |
SLS/196603 |