Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 157 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5911 Week
» 33869 Month
» 68511 Year
» 1290076 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7066 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77066 m/e 01/1945
BR 90536 m/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 4882
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal During 08/1963
Scrapping During 10/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 20 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
66A Polmadie 8w/e 19/04/1952
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 24/03/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN THJ Thornton Junction 13/08/1947
LOAN 65F   22/05/1949
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 07/04/1962
WDN   05/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7066
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4882
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77066    
04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90536    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90536    
10/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev