Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1114 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18917 Week
» 71933 Month
» 191460 Year
» 3218313 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7074 |
m/e |
07/1943 |
War Dept. |
77074 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90543 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2290 |
Works Number |
4890 |
To Service |
During 07/1943 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 22/02/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
FEL |
Feltham |
4w/e |
26/09/1947 |
LOAN |
25D |
Mirfield |
w/e |
17/06/1950 |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
ALLOC |
56A |
Wakefield |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/02/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/07/1947 |
Brighton Works |
New 'West Country' Pacifics under construction were 21C164-170. This completes the order. These latter ones have a V-shaped cab-front. Locos. being repaired:-2021, 2039, 2345, 2567, 21C118, 77030, 77037, 77074, 77094, 77098, 77178, 77181, and 77444. The repair of the 'Austerity' locos. is top priority hence the recent lag in 'West Country' construction. L.B. and S.C.R. No. 82 Boxhill (ex 380.S) and 377.S are both in L.B. and S.C.R. livery. 19 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were observed stored in sidings between Dover and Folkstone (16/7). Only Nos. available were 77029, 77393, and 70825. |
SLS/194709 |
26/09/1947 |
Brighton Works |
The following WD 2-8-0's were release from repair at Brighton Works for service from Feltham (FEL) depot: 77030, 77074 an 77460. |
SLS/194711 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7074 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4890 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77074 |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90543 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
22/02/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90543 |
|
|
08/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |
|
|