Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 147 Today
» 1178 Yesterday
» 3470 Week
» 17727 Month
» 245611 Year
» 1467176 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7076 m/e 07/1943
War Dept. 77076 m/e 01/1945
BR 90545 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 4892
To Service During 07/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 03/10/1965
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 22 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1943
64A St Margarets 4w/e 23/02/1952
38A Colwick 4w/e 19/09/1953
40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 19/06/1954
40E Colwick w/e 07/05/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 03/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN EFD Eastfield 25/08/1947
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 23/02/1952
LOAN 38A Colwick 4w/e 03/10/1953
LOAN 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 15/09/1956
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 14/05/1960
WDN   w/e 03/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/04/1947 Stonor Dump A visit to the 'dump' at Stonor on 14/4 found only six of the original 110 2-8-0 engines remaining. These were 77076, 77337, 77425, 77457, 78682 and 79184. Of these, 77457 would appear to be the next to leave, as it had been moved up near to the S.R. line, while 78682 does not appear to have moved from the position it occupied last June. All six were dirty, rusty and appeared to be in need of repair, and three of them (77076, 77337 and 79184) had had their builders' plates taken away. The Nissen type engine shed close by the main Ramsgate-Sandwich road was occupied by W.D. 0-6-0 ST. No. 75110, which was in steam. SLS/194706

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7076
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4892
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77076    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90545    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
19/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
03/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90545    

prev prev