Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 829 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14235 Week
» 67251 Month
» 186778 Year
» 3213631 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7079 |
m/e |
08/1943 |
War Dept. |
77079 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90548 |
on |
26/06/1951 (at Swindon Factory) |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2290 |
Works Number |
4895 |
To Service |
During 08/1943 |
Withdrawal |
During 04/1964 |
Service Life |
20 yrs , 8 mths |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1945 |
Austerities |
It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them. 280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944. |
SLS/194602 |
31/05/1947 |
Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works |
W.D. locos. which have been repaired at these Works can readily be distinguished from those which have passed through Swindon, as they are painted all black, with red buffer beams and plain lettering. The following are amongst those which have been dealt with here: Nos. 77026, 77053, 77079, 77097, 77106, 77123, 77184, 77202. 77210, 77214, 77241, 77247, 77257, 77289. 77380, 77388, 78522, 78566, 78717 and 79244. |
SLS/194708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7079 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4895 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77079 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oxley (OXY) |
|
|
15/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
26/06/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90548 |
|
|
14/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
05/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
04/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90548 |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|