Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1861 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15267 Week
» 68283 Month
» 187810 Year
» 3214663 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7081 |
m/e |
08/1943 |
War Dept. |
77081 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90550 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2290 |
Works Number |
4897 |
To Service |
During 08/1943 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1943 |
31B |
|
March |
w/e |
03/11/1951 |
36A |
|
Doncaster |
4w/e |
16/03/1957 |
36C |
|
Frodingham |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
on |
25/06/1947 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
w/e |
03/11/1951 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
on |
12/07/1953 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
4w/e |
20/02/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1946 |
W.D. Locomotives |
The following have been noted at Folkestone recently: 77070/81, 77122/9, 77222, 77402/11/26/84, 77508, 78588. As they carried allocations painted on the cab sides, they have presumably been in traffic on the continent. |
SLS/194605 |
28/02/1946 |
Locomotives Miscellany |
More W.D. 2-8-0's appear to be allocated to B.A.; many of these engines were lately standing about in the Dover areas. 'Schools' 907 'Dulwich,' 917 'Ardingly,' 934 'St. Lawrence' are light green. 'Demob.' specials are still running frequently from Folkestone, etc., to Guildford via Tonbridge and Redhill, worked to the latter by locos, carrying Dover spare duty Nos, 462-3, but actually the engines are often B.A. or AFD. 4-4-0's. They return light from Redhill it not otherwise required. |
SLS/194605 |
28/02/1946 |
W.D. Locomotives |
The following have been noted at Folkestone recently: 77070/81, 77122/9, 77222, 77402/11/26/84, 77508, 78588. As they carried allocations painted on the cab sides, they have presumably been in traffic on the continent. |
SLS/194605 |
02/02/1955 |
York Station |
44927 (24E) visited York on 2nd February with an excursion from Blackpool. On the following day 43051 (51D) was at York en route for Doncaster Works, and on 8th February 67748 (34E) was at York bound for Darlington Works with 67720 (34A) proceeding south again after overhaul at Darlington. On 10th February 61078 (38E) was at York returning to the GC section after repair at Darlington and 61141 (38C) arrived in similar circumstances on 12th February. Other unusual visitors to York on 12th February were 78022 on the 9.40 a.m. Sheffield to York (S.O.) and the 1.0 p.m. York to Sheffield (S.O.), 48252 (5B), and 68429 (50C) presumed returning to Selby again after a period of loan to Sunderland. In the northbound direction were 61744 (40F) and 61757 (40F), heading for Cowlairs Works and 90550 (31B) for repair at Darlington. |
SLS/195504 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7081 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4897 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77081 |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90550 |
|
|
03/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
06/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90550 |
|
|
12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|