Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2871 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16277 Week
» 69293 Month
» 188820 Year
» 3215673 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7085 |
m/e |
08/1943 |
War Dept. |
77085 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90551 |
w/e |
23/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2290 |
Works Number |
4901 |
To Service |
During 08/1943 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 17/04/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 8 mths , 17 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/01/1947 |
Shakespeare Cliff |
There were 22 'Austerity' 2-8-0's on the sidings west of Shakespeare Cliff Tunnel on 3/1/47. and these included 77078, 77085, 77095, 77162, 77222, 77292, 77300, 77364, 77371, 77390, 77395, 78588, NS4320, NS4342, NS4364, NS4400, and six more, whose numbers could not be read. |
SLS/194702 |
10/03/1963 |
Doncaster Works (Stripping Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. |
SLS/196304 |
11/05/1963 |
Worcester Works (Stripping Shop) |
4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7085 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4901 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77085 |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
23/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90551 |
|
|
13/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
22/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
11/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
17/04/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90551 |
|
|
10/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|